Trustees THE HEALTH FOUNDATION
Charity number: 286967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR HUGH TAYLOR KCB | Chair | 13 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Paul John Najsarek | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
James Roland Sinker | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Dawn Edge | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Blacklock | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ravi Gurumurthy | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Smart | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Ruth Hussey | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|||||||
Eric Gregory | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Loraine Hawkins | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Rosalind Louise Smyth FMedSci | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
Branwen Jeffreys | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.