Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, CAPEL ST MARY

Charity number: 286971
Charity reporting is overdue by 78 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.50k £1.56k £2.93k £702 £2.03k
Total expenditure £621 £2.31k £605 £0 £209
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A