ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 287003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 August 2019 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 April 2017 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required