DAVID PEARLMAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 287009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 20 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 20 June 2016 On time Download