DAVID PEARLMAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 287009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr H A Pearlman Trustee 30 October 2015 None on record
STUART APPLEMAN Trustee 05 December 2003
LONDON JEWISH FAMILY CENTRE LTD Received: 80 days late
JEWISH MUSIC INSTITUTE Received: On time
MICHAEL GOLDBERGER Trustee 20 July 2000
THE SPAN TRUST Received: On time
JONATHAN HAGER Trustee 17 November 2005
SHAAREI ORAH LTD
ADAR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
MGS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
DAVID ALLAN PEARLMAN Trustee 19 September 1991 None on record