Financial history THE BIOSOCIAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 287044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.00k £3.47k £3.47k £3.35k £945
Total expenditure £2.65k £2.88k £1.83k £1.10k £740
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A