THE SOFA PROJECT

Charity number: 287088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.03m £1.01m £731.99k £734.70k £641.58k
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.01m £762.77k £744.57k £640.76k
Income from government contracts £433.22k £441.72k £245.45k £193.58k £251.92k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £128.44k £116.85k £84.67k £105.75k £99.96k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £859.01k £849.71k £606.15k £587.67k £500.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.89k £38.99k £41.17k £41.29k £40.99k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £984.05k £750.93k £733.55k £631.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.56k £24.97k £11.85k £11.02k £9.29k
Expenditure - Governance £5.10k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0