THE SOFA PROJECT

Charity number: 287088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keith Hicks Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
David Wait Trustee 25 March 2021
PAHAR TRUST NEPAL Received: On time
Caroline Turner-Inskip Trustee 21 February 2019 None on record
Ruth Snary Trustee 19 November 2013 None on record
Marianne Reed Trustee 28 October 2016 None on record
Peter Templeton Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Kate Clifford Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
Mr C Neild Trustee 28 October 2016 None on record