TOWER HAMLETS LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 287282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download