THE CENTRE FOR ECONOMIC POLICY RESEARCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CEPR's mission is to promote world-class economic research and deliver the policy-relevant results to decision-makers: Research Excellence with Policy Relevance. It provides common services for its network of researchers and for users of its research, and obtains funding for the activities it develops, executing projects once funding is obtained, and reporting to donors on activities undertaken.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income:
£6,591,962
Donations and legacies | £6.23m | |
Charitable activities | £363.10k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.01k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,192,852
Raising funds | £32.74k | |
Charitable activities | £6.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,313,312 from 2 government contract(s) and £3,138,684 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £32.74k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.16m | |
Retained for future use | £399.11k |
People
25 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Islington
Governance
- 20 June 1983: Standard registration
- C E P R (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF SIR CHARLES RICHARD BEAN | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francis Bloch | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Klaus Regling | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ferdinando Giugliano | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Governor Signe Krogstrup | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivier Garnier | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Pierre Landau | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Woosey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Patrick Honohan | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Fingleton | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRONWYN NANETTE CURTIS | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Venables | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.40m | £6.01m | £4.57m | £4.79m | £6.59m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50m | £6.37m | £3.86m | £4.33m | £6.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £508.48k | £963.47k | £1.06m | £1.28m | £1.31m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.61m | £2.36m | £2.46m | £2.41m | £3.14m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.04m | £5.48m | £4.20m | £4.41m | £6.23m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £351.48k | £521.43k | £357.85k | £381.14k | £363.10k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.63k | £10.17k | £12.47k | £525 | £3.01k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.50m | £6.31m | £3.83m | £4.31m | £6.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.61k | £58.87k | £28.40k | £25.68k | £32.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.95k | £25.60k | £29.54k | £30.01k | £70.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.36m | £1.54m | £1.12m | £1.21m | £1.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £44.71k | £44.01k | £38.96k | £134.19k | £178.95k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.25m | £2.35m | £3.21m | £4.32m | £4.27m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.51m | £974.99k | £1.12m | £1.86m | £1.46m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MAY 1983 AMENDED 7 JUNE 1983, 13 JANUARY 1996, 8TH SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 12TH DECEMBER 2003. as amended on 27 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE EFFICIENT FUNCTIONING OF THE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ECONOMY BY CONDUCTING AND PROMOTING STUDIES AND RESEARCH INTO OPEN ECONOMIES AND THE RELATIONS BETWEEN THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Centre For Economic Policy Research
33 Great Sutton Street
London
EC1V 0DX
- Phone:
- 02071838801
- Email:
- cepr@cepr.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window