Accounts and annual returns THE RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 287301
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 February 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 July 2018 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required