Accounts and annual returns WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST

Charity number: 287400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window