Financial history WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST

Charity number: 287400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £273.11k £202.69k £28.06k £19.11k £10.14k
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.02m £538.78k £23.86k £18.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £168.00k N/A N/A N/A