THE FRENCH BULLDOG WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue French bulldogs, give veterinary treatment when necessary. Rehome to caring suitable owners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 September 1983: Standard registration
- FRENCH BULLDOG WELFARE TRUST (Working name)
- THE FRENCH BULLDOG CLUB OF ENGLAND WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GORDON | Chair | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hamilton | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Hickin | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Waddington | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Stansfield | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.34k | £4.09k | £3.70k | £2.74k | £2.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.71k | £3.69k | £19.42k | £14.71k | £6.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF FRENCH BULLDOGS WHICHA ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, OR POOR CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Windsor Terrace
Whitley Bay
NE26 2NS
- Phone:
- 01912809177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window