THE TOWNSEND HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 287480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

amenity and general cultural centre for the benefit and education of the residents of West Somerset and for visitors to the district

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,272
Total expenditure: £13,339

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Taylor Chair 31 August 2019
None on record
Cherry Burroughs Trustee 31 August 2021
None on record
David Segar Trustee 30 August 2019
None on record
MICHAEL SCOTT BAINBRIDGE Trustee 03 April 2013
None on record
Dr TIMOTHY CHARLES ROSS Trustee 03 April 2013
None on record
DAVID MARTYN SEGAR Trustee 03 April 2013
None on record
SALLY BAINBRIDGE Trustee
None on record
PETER CONRAD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.35k £14.03k £11.58k £7.42k £8.27k
Total expenditure £9.53k £6.94k £855 £8.11k £13.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.32k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 June 2021 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Townsend House
Townsend Road
Minehead
TA24 5RG
Phone:
01643818476
Email:
No information available