Trustees BRIGHTON AND HOVE SOCIAL WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 287516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ahmad Yabroudi Trustee 03 November 2021
SUSSEX SYRIAN COMMUNITY CIO
Recently registered
Dr Aisha El-Turki Trustee 03 November 2021
ALNOURE ACADEMY
Received: On time
Jonathan Anthony White Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Christine Irene El-Shabba Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Awel Harun Abdo Trustee 24 October 2018
None on record
ROB BERRY Trustee 21 October 2015
None on record
MURIEL BRIAULT Trustee 06 November 2012
None on record
ANN PACKHAM Trustee 06 November 2012
None on record