Financial history Commonwealth Jewish Council

Charity number: 287564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £43.74k £112.42k £112.86k £122.06k £119.86k
Total expenditure £66.06k £105.91k £110.26k £90.06k £128.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A