THE PETERBOROUGH SOUP KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Feeding the homeless and disadvantaged
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 19 August 1983: Standard registration
- SINGLE HOMELESS AND ROOTLESS PROJECT (PETERBOROUGH) (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Cannizzaro | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAXINE DRAKE MS | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Richard Pike | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Freeman | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DAWSON | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE STAPLEFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1982 AS AMENDED ON 26/07/1994 AS AMENDED ON 11/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PETERBOROUGH.
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
127 Loke Road
KING'S LYNN
PE30 2BG
- Phone:
- 07808232005
- Website:
-
peterboroughsoupkitchen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.