THE BRITISH AND IRISH HYPERTENSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 287635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £159.91k £145.28k £135.18k £128.48k £51.13k
Total expenditure £179.61k £180.54k £174.46k £145.86k £100.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A