Accounts and annual returns BARNET MARK MASTER MASONS NUMBER 947 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 287651
Charity reporting is overdue by 349 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 349 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 349 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 September 2021 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2020 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 November 2019 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required