ST FRANCIS' COLLEGE TRUST

Charity number: 287694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 05 June 2017 On time Download