82ND BRISTOL (ST BERNADETTE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 287697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £29.33k £41.47k £39.71k £25.56k £46.27k
Total expenditure £42.27k £29.94k £39.16k £20.44k £21.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.72k