82ND BRISTOL (ST BERNADETTE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 287697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Norley Trustee 28 June 2019 None on record
Philip Hennessey Trustee 12 March 2009 None on record
Lianne Sheldon Trustee 22 May 2015 None on record
Katie Aplin Trustee 28 June 2019 None on record
MR STEVE WILLIAMS Chair
BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Jemma Williams Trustee 28 June 2019 None on record
Kathryn Maynard Trustee 24 July 2020 None on record
Kevin Morley Trustee 20 June 2013 None on record