ADDINGTON ST MARY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 287701
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 29 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required