Financial history UNITY CENTRE OF SOUTH LONDON

Charity number: 287707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.09k £14.01k £12.53k £13.18k £9.68k
Total expenditure £9.58k £14.00k £16.13k £17.45k £8.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A