RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 287716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recreation Ground

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £150
Total expenditure: £202

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN EDWARDS BARHAM Trustee 28 December 2019
None on record
KENNETH EDWARD PRICE Trustee
None on record
HUGH MILLER Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER MARK WELLER Trustee
None on record
GERVASE JAMES SHERLOCK Trustee
None on record
DAVID BRUCE COLEBROOK Trustee
None on record
JOHN SNOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £125 £70 £405 £175 £150
Total expenditure £201 £182 £182 £202 £202
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RESTLAND
HOE LANE
PEASLAKE
GUILDFORD
GU5 9SW
Phone:
01306730998
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available