Financial history ST NICHOLAS HOSPICE SUFFOLK

Charity number: 287773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.11m £6.09m £6.20m £6.08m £6.95m
Total expenditure £6.93m £7.61m £7.76m £6.75m £6.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £127.98k
Income from government grants £1.24m £1.16m £1.44m £1.41m £1.96m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.44m £2.39m £2.14m £1.38m £2.57m
Income - Other trading activities £2.22m £2.35m £2.44m £1.22m £2.15m
Income - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.16m £1.27m £2.98m £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £158.55k £143.57k £179.01k £138.32k £130.75k
Income - Other £49.44k £48.04k £165.00k £362.93k £27.96k
Income - Legacies £1.27m £1.28m £1.03m £428.13k £1.66m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.44m £4.92m £4.93m £4.25m £3.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.49m £2.70m £2.83m £2.50m £2.63m
Expenditure - Governance £130.38k £165.76k £127.55k £166.64k £163.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £70.76k £53.82k £39.15k £35.97k £38.23k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0