ST NICHOLAS HOSPICE SUFFOLK

Charity number: 287773
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Masson Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
SUSAN HAYTER Trustee 08 December 2011 None on record
Anne Fisher Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
Christopher James Minett Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
Donna Forster Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
Neil Morgan Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
Karen Chandler-Smith Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
Ann Langdon Trustee 08 August 2016 None on record
CHARLES HADDON MCBRATNEY SIMPSON Chair 26 March 2015 None on record
MARION MILES Trustee 08 December 2011 None on record