Financial history THE BRITISH FILM INSTITUTE

Charity number: 287780
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £95.72m £96.91m £95.17m £113.52m £145.63m
Total expenditure £98.39m £100.30m £106.53m £124.71m £156.61m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.97m £23.59m £21.72m £34.92m £77.71m
Income - Donations and legacies £30.93m £31.13m £6.59m £90.22m £81.86m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £19.75m £20.07m £22.38m £23.23m £13.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.00k £9.00k £45.00k £65.00k £27.00k
Income - Other £45.04m £45.70m £66.15m £0 £49.88m
Income - Legacies £1.11m £389.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £95.94m £98.42m £104.87m £122.45m £154.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.62m £1.78m £1.66m £2.26m £1.86m
Expenditure - Governance £348.00k £391.00k £370.00k £361.00k £354.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £40.94m £28.98m £6.14m £51.79m £55.24m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £826.00k £97.00k £0 £0 £0