RIVERSIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of Riverside Trust is the management and operation of Riverside Studios, an arts and community centre located at 101 Queen Caroline Street, Hammersmith. Riverside Trust brings artists, audiences and our communities together to open minds and change lives through the collaborative nature of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income:
£4,155,087
Donations and legacies | £1.53m | |
Charitable activities | £1.70m | |
Other trading activities | £917.35k | |
Investments | £99 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,563,762
Raising funds | £31.56k | |
Charitable activities | £6.53m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,205,900 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £31.56k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.53m |
People

78 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 1983: Standard registration
- THE RIVERSIDE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gregory Edward | Chair | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Guy Hornsby | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rob Berkeley | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laure Vaysse | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ellison | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Outram | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Knevett | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Marks | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Price | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Collin Woodward | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Morgan | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAN LARGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £765.08k | £243.01k | £957.79k | £3.03m | £4.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £1.01m | £2.91m | £5.67m | £6.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.15k | N/A | N/A | £820.99k | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £14.19k | N/A | £331.95k | £1.51m | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £311.89k | £917.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £742.31k | N/A | £623.09k | £1.21m | £1.70m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.58k | N/A | £2.75k | £240 | £99 | |
|
Income - Other | £3.00k | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.09m | N/A | £1.36m | £5.50m | £6.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £193.62k | £174.30k | £31.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.62k | N/A | £520.01k | £43.04k | £91.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £582.80k | N/A | £1.36m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.19m | N/A | £39.91m | £39.15m | £37.60m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.29m | N/A | £1.63m | £1.25m | £1.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £167.92k | N/A | £25.19m | £26.69m | £27.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2015 as amended on 20 Aug 2018 as amended on 18 Jan 2016 as amended on 11 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF PERSONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE AREA OF GREATER LONDON AND THROUGHOUT THE UK IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING THE ARTS OF DRAMA BALLET MIME DANCE MUSIC SINGING OPERA LITERATURE PAINTING DRAWING SCULPTURE CERAMICS FILM MAKING AND PHOTOGRAPHY IN A LIVE OR DIGITAL FORM AND FOR SUCH PURPOSE TO OPERATE MANAGE AND ADMINISTER THE COMMUNITY ART CENTRE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM KNOWN AS RIVERSIDE STUDIOS. 2. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR PERSONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE AREA OF GREATER LONDON IF SUCH PROVISION IS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANT THORNTON UK LLP
30 FINSBURY SQUARE
LONDON
EC2A 1AG
- Phone:
- 02920347505
- Email:
- SHARON.M.BRADLEY@UK.GT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window