Riverside Trust

Charity number: 287848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Gregory Edward Chair 11 June 2019 None on record
Dr Rob Berkeley Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
DAN LARGE Trustee None on record
Michelle Marks Trustee 12 July 2018 None on record
Alan Morgan Trustee 21 May 2013 None on record
John Collin Woodward Trustee 24 March 2015 None on record
Laure Vaysse Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
John Knevett Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
Christopher Outram Trustee 03 December 2019 None on record
Jane Ellison Trustee 03 December 2020
Libraries Connected Received: On time
Robin Price Trustee 20 June 2017 None on record