THE ST MICHAEL'S COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 287883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Christian community centre offering range of community activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £30,293
Total expenditure: £31,223

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Paul Chair 05 July 2018
None on record
Rustum Enegbeta Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
MARION WILLIAMS Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.81k £29.88k £23.44k £41.48k £30.29k
Total expenditure £15.19k £9.91k £10.03k £29.04k £31.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 February 2023 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 February 2023 379 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2023 744 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Michael's Community Centre
Desmond Street
New Cross
SE14 6JF
Phone:
02086912167
Website:

No information available