Financial history CAMDEN CHINESE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 288008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £853.85k £730.29k £617.05k £584.48k £520.84k
Total expenditure £739.22k £663.66k £595.22k £485.37k £484.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £236.23k £207.10k £232.76k £223.44k
Income from government grants £115.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £195.37k £20.66k £19.93k £42.96k £13.92k
Income - Other trading activities £104.08k £229.03k £188.80k £169.18k £208.54k
Income - Charitable activities £531.90k £475.53k £402.80k £236.46k £256.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £447 £362 £354 £1.45k £28
Income - Other £22.05k £4.71k £5.17k £134.44k £41.83k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £710.65k £638.10k £569.43k £465.37k £455.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.20k £12.71k £10.53k £4.34k £9.45k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £15.26k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12.36k £12.85k £15.26k £15.66k £18.58k