Financial history MYTCHETT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £113.26k £113.58k £86.31k £100.73k £122.03k
Total expenditure £133.83k £100.23k £80.02k £69.11k £110.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £45.91k £41.15k £6.15k