ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE PARENTS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 November 2020 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 17 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 21 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required