Governing document ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE PARENTS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 288052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED ON 11 JULY 2005, 15 FEBRUARY 2007, 29 JUNE 2010 AND 18 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST. JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EXTRA FACILITIES FOR SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.