Financial history AUTISM HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 288141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.71m £4.33m £4.30m £4.11m £4.13m
Total expenditure £4.46m £4.02m £4.37m £4.03m £4.75m
Income from government contracts £3.79m £3.34m £237.08k £3.93m £3.78m
Income from government grants £93.93k £70.90k £136.64k £154.53k £153.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £186.09k £156.79k £50.38k £73.79k £69.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £57.77k £30.28k £102.88k
Income - Charitable activities £3.89m £3.96m £4.17m £4.00m £3.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £89 £2.27k £2.75k £4.04k £4.00k
Income - Other £638.49k £213.45k £0 £0 £24.93k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £19.85k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.37m £3.96m £4.25m £3.88m £4.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £93.19k £58.45k £123.62k £146.71k £187.16k
Expenditure - Governance £269.35k £0 £9.98k £10.94k £12.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0