Governing document AUTISM HAMPSHIRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/12/2013
Charitable objects
AUTISM HAMPSHIRE IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, ADULT SERVICES, OUTREACH AND TRAINING SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM OR SIMILAR CONDITIONS AND FOR THE WIDER AUTISM COMMUNITY IN PORTSMOUTH, SOUTHAMPTON, HAMPSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE (“THE OBJECTS”).
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.