Trustees AUTISM HAMPSHIRE
Charity number: 288141

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN HARDIE | Chair | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reddy | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robertson | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Nash | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Parry | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Turnbull | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW EDMONDS | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM SHIELDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.