Financial history THE FUELLERS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 288157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £46.14k £224.90k £47.62k £229.86k £49.00k
Total expenditure £31.58k £48.12k £35.58k £56.44k £64.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A