Trustees THE FUELLERS CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 288157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chloe Andrews-Jones Chair 17 December 2019
CITY OF LONDON SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
John Philip Bainbridge Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
William Michael Walworth Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record
Michael James Hogg Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record
Carole Elizabeth Marsh Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
NEVILLE ANTHONY BROWN Trustee 07 May 2017
None on record
Shravan Joshi CBE CC Trustee 20 May 2013
None on record
RUSSEL NEALE WARBURTON FCA Trustee 15 December 2010
None on record