Financial history HELPAGE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 288180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.92m £22.00m £20.73m £22.08m £29.40m
Total expenditure £23.73m £21.27m £21.27m £20.68m £21.97m
Income from government contracts £215.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.69m £6.27m £6.39m £5.31m £14.23m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.00k £16.00k £20.00k £10.00k £6.00k
Income - Other £14.22m £15.71m £14.32m £16.77m £15.17m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.65m £21.27m £21.27m £20.68m £21.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £154.00k £160.00k £0 £95.00k £104.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81.00k £0 £0 £0 £0