Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL SCHOOL OF LAW APPEAL

Charity number: 288190
Charity reporting is overdue by 319 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 319 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 319 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 08 January 2024 495 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 October 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 September 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required