Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL SCHOOL OF LAW APPEAL
Charity number: 288190

Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Ken Oliphant | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sir David Roderick Lessiter Bodey | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Rodrigues | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clair Gammage | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Devyani Prabhat | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma Short | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Herrington | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Keith Stanton | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor LOIS BIBBINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.