Financial history THE HAEMOPHILIA SOCIETY

Charity number: 288260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £682.39k £1.26m £924.74k £814.96k £749.43k
Total expenditure £778.13k £1.07m £949.87k £771.52k £1.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £14.09k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £512.55k £478.49k £756.47k £657.32k £584.64k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £39.36k £8.99k
Income - Charitable activities £126.40k £746.40k £117.21k £76.69k £120.26k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £625 £250
Income - Investment £28.07k £35.12k £39.62k £41.58k £35.54k
Income - Other £15.37k £4.74k £11.44k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £109.42k £34.85k £351.23k £220.29k £227.46k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £674.94k £940.52k £850.83k £656.30k £895.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £103.20k £132.05k £99.04k £115.22k £287.18k
Expenditure - Governance £27.41k £32.75k £12.25k £8.85k £13.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £15.00k £20.08k £15.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0