Trustees THE HAEMOPHILIA SOCIETY
Charity number: 288260

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Owen-Wyard | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stretch | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Lawson | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rayaz Ali Chel | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Geffert | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Dixon | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Traunter | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Conan McIlwrath | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sartain | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sonia O'Hara | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Smith | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.