RIVER THAMES SOCIETY

Charity number: 288380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 14 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 14 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 18 April 2017 On time Download