RIVER THAMES SOCIETY

Charity number: 288380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN LEWIS REYNOLDS Trustee None on record
Hilary Pereira Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
DR PROF JACK BETTERIDGE Trustee None on record
PETER FINCH Chair None on record
Peter John Hall Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Thomas Robert Berman Trustee 06 April 2019 None on record
Rupert Thomas Bagilhole Trustee 23 April 2016 None on record
Jacqueline Fiona Lambert Trustee 23 April 2016 None on record
Gillian Rix Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
Roy Miller Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Abigail Helen Elizabeth Reynolds Trustee 08 April 2017
ABINGDON DIVISION GUIDES Received: On time
DAVID LAMBERT Trustee None on record
JOHN SKUSE BDS FDS Trustee None on record
John Richard Tamsitt Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
LESLIE DAVID JONES OBE Trustee
PURLEY PARK TRUST LIMITED Received: On time