GERMAN WELFARE COUNCIL

Charity number: 288538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 March 2020 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download