Trustees GERMAN WELFARE COUNCIL

Charity number: 288538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
UDO BAUER Chair 15 June 2017
THE CONGREGATION AT GERMAN CHRIST CHURCH LONDON
Received: 65 days late
Anna Haase Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Andreas Blum Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Barbara von Alten Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
JULIAN RHYS Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record
VERENA GRONEWOLD Trustee
None on record